House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|