Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2022
Bill January 25, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022
Analysis November 29, 2021