Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/26/2021 | Filed |