Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 905
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 905
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/27/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|