Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2022