Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0668 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 11, 2022