Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS by Health Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/28/2021 | Filed |