Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0706 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 11, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022