House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|