Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Now in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Agriculture; Health Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/02/2021 | Filed |