|
06/01/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-144
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (496561)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 86, NAYS 28
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 496561 engrossed amendment (replaces 748401, 219473, 669863)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 748401 adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 219473 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 669863 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 28 NAYS 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|