Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0764 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021