Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0772 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 11, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022