Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0786 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill January 13, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021