Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/02/2021 | Filed |