Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 287
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 287
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|