Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0802 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022