Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/04/2021 | Filed |