Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0830 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill November 30, 2021