Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/04/2021 | Filed |