Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | CS by Health Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/19/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/04/2021 | Filed |