Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 30, 2021