Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 399
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 399
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|