|
04/28/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-76
|
|
|
|
04/27/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/27/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for HB 761
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|