|
06/10/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-186
|
|
|
|
06/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 573
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
CS by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/11/22, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Education; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|