Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0898 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 27, 2022