Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0954 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022