Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0988 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 18, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022