Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1000 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 11, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022