Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/19/2021 | Filed |