Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Now in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/25/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Health Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | Filed |