Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/22/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/23/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|