Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022