|
05/12/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-107
|
|
|
|
05/12/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 773
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (366794)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/24/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|