|
05/23/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-132
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 732
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (056655)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment 285805 superseded by substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment 056655 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for HB 695
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|