Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022