Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1066 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2022