Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Filed |