Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022