Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/18/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Filed |