Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022