Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022