Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/01/2021 | Filed |