|
05/19/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-124
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 669
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Banking and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/18/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Banking and Insurance; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|