Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1156 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022