Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Education | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Transportation; Education; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/03/2021 | Filed |