Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | CS by Transportation read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/07/2021 | Filed |