Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022