Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 777
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 777
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Finance and Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|