Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022